No. 19-248
Title:Walid Jammal, et al., Petitioners
v.
American Family Insurance Company, et al.
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1287
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4125)
   Decision Date:January 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2019Application (18A1287) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 23, 2019 to August 22, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Jun 11 2019Application (18A1287) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 22, 2019.
Aug 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Brief of respondents American Family Insurance Company, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Nov 13 2019Reply of petitioners Walid Jammal, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

bfletcher@law.stanford.edu
6507243345
Party name: Walid Jammal, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: American Family Insurance Company, et al.
Lauren Suzanne KuleySquire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
201 E. Fourth St. Suite 1900
Cincinnati, OH 45202

lauren.kuley@squirepb.com
5133611241
Party name: American Family Insurance Company, et al.