No. 19-247
Title:City of Boise, Idaho, Petitioner
v.
Robert Martin, et al.
Docketed:August 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1264
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35845)
   Decision Date:September 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2019Application (18A1264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 30, 2019 to August 29, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 04 2019Application (18A1264) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 29, 2019.
Aug 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, City of Boise.
Blanket Consent
Sep 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Robert Martin, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019.
Sep 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Brentwood Community Council filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Sep 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Downtown Denver Partnership filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Amicus brief of Amici Curiae States of Idaho, Alaska, Indiana, Louisiana, Nebraska, South Dakota and Texas not accepted for filing. (September 24, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Sep 24 2019Brief amici curiae of Amici Curiae California State Association of Counties and 33 California Counties and Cities filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of City of Aberdeen, Washington filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amici curiae of Amici Curiae States of Idaho, Alaska, Indiana, Louisiana, Nebraska, South Dakota and Texas filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Boise Metro Chamber of Commerce, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Stephen Eide filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Seven Cities in Orange County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of California State Sheriffs' Association, California Police Chiefs Association, and California Peace Officers' Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Maryrose Courtney and Ketchum-Downtown YMCA filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of The People Concern and Weingart Center Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Los Angeles Area Chamber of Commerce and Central City Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of League of Oregon Cities filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Venice Stakeholders Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of City of Los Angeles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Building Owners and Managers Association of Oregon filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief amici curiae of International Downtown Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2019Brief of respondents Robert Martin, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Nov 13 2019Reply of petitioner City of Boise filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
213.229.7726
Party name: City of Boise
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Evan Bern
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-1304

michael.bern@lw.com
202-637-1021
Party name: Robert Martin, et al.
Other
Stanley L. Garnett
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 Seventeenth Street
Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202-4437

sgarnett@bhfs.com
303.223.1100
Party name: The Downtown Denver Partnership
Fred D. Heather
    Counsel of Record
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
10250 Constellation Blvd.
19th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

fheather@glaserweil.com
3105533000
Party name: Brentwood Community Council
Anna Marie Joyce
    Counsel of Record
Markowitz Herbold PC
1455 SW Broadway, Suite 1900
Portland, OR 97201

annajoyce@markowitzherbold.com
503-295-3085
Party name: League of Oregon Cities
Michael Edward Kenneally Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.kenneally@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: The People Concern and Weingart Center Association
Mary Patrice Kent
    Counsel of Record
City of Aberdeen
200 East Market Street
Aberdeen, WA 98520

pkent@aberdeenwa.gov
3605373233
Party name: City of Aberdeen, Washington
Megan Ann Larrondo
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Idaho
954 W. Jefferson -2nd Floor
Boise, ID 83720-0010

megan.larrondo@ag.idaho.gov
208-332-3548
Party name: Amici Curiae States of Idaho, Alaska, Indiana, Louisiana, Nebraska, South Dakota and Texas
Jeffrey Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Jeff Lewis Law
609 Deep Valley Drive
Suite 200
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Jeff@JeffLewisLaw.com
3109354001
Party name: Venice Stakeholders Association
Lori Alvino McGill
    Counsel of Record
Lori Alvino McGill PC
1056 Thomas Jefferson Street, NW
Washington, DC 20007

alvinomcgill@gmail.com
9146469410
Party name: Los Angeles Area Chamber of Commerce and Central City Association
Craig L. Meadows
    Counsel of Record
Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley LLP
877 Main Street, Suite 1000
PO Box 1617
Boise, ID 83701

cmeadows@hawleytroxell.com
208-388-4866
Party name: Boise Metro Chamber of Commerce, Inc.
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
202-879-7658
Party name: Seven Cities in Orange County
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rsimpson@wileyrein.com
(202) 719-7000
Party name: MARYROSE COURTNEY AND KETCHUM-DOWNTOWN YMCA
Teresa Lynn Stricker
    Counsel of Record
Renne Public Law Group, LLC
350 Sansome Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94104

tstricker@publiclawgroup.com
4158487200
Party name: Amici Curiae California State Association of Counties and 33 California Counties and Cities
James R. Touchstone
    Counsel of Record
Jones & Mayer
3777 North Harbor Boulevard
Fullerton, CA 92835

jrt@jones-mayer.com
714-446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Association, California Police Chiefs Association, and California Peace Officers' Association
Matthew Donald Umhofer
    Counsel of Record
Spertus, Landes & Umhofer LLP
617 W. 7th Street, Suite 200
Los Angeles, CA 90017

matthew@spertuslaw.com
213-205-6520
Party name: International Downtown Association, et al.
Kathryn J. Zoglin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the City Attorney
200 East Santa Clara Street
16th Floor
San Jose, CA 95113

katie.zoglin@sanjoseca.gov
408-535-1900
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.
Owen Douglas Blank
    Counsel of Record
Tonkon Torp LLP
888 SW 5th Ave.
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

owen.blank@tonkon.com
5038022011
Party name: Building Owners and Managers Association of Oregon
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Valerie Louise Flores
    Counsel of Record
Los Angeles City Attorney's Office
200 North Main Street, MS 140, 7th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012

vflores262@gmail.com
2139788130
Party name: City of Los Angeles
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
1629 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

tfrank@gmail.com
7032033848
Party name: Stephen Eide