No. 19-239 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Larry Benzon, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Troy Michael Kell
Docketed:August 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4191)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2019 to October 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2019.
Sep 23 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana/et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Larry Benzon, Warden, Utah State Prison
Attorneys for Respondent
Lindsey Layer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Arizona
850 West Adams Street
Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

lindsey_layer@fd.org
602-390-3125
Party name: Troy Michael Kell
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana