No. 19-234
Title:Libertarian National Committee, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Federal Election Commission
Docketed:August 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5227)
   Decision Date:May 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2019 to October 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2019.
Sep 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Libertarian National Committee, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Election Commission
Other
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
7038946846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute