No. 19-230
Title:Douglas Prade, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:August 21, 2019
Linked with 18A1243
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Ohio, Summit County
   Case Numbers:(28193)
   Decision Date:September 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 20, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2019Application (18A1243) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 18, 2019 to August 17, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 30 2019Application (18A1243) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 19, 2019.
Aug 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Reply of petitioner Douglas Prade filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Booth Alden
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
North Point, 901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114

dbalden@jonesday.com
(216) 586-7121
Party name: Douglas Prade
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacquenette Susanne Corgan
    Counsel of Record
Summit County Prosecutor's Office
53 University Ave.
6th Floor
Akron, OH 44308

jcorgan@prosecutor.summitoh.net
3306432800
Party name: State of Ohio