No. 19-229
Title:C. D., By and Through Her Parents, M. D. and P. D., et al., Petitioners
v.
Natick Public School District, et al.
Docketed:August 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1794)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 20, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2019, for all respondents.
Nov 15 2019Waiver of right of respondent Masssachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: C.D., by and through her parents and next friends, M.D. and P.D., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ann Margaret O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Murphy, Hesse, et al.
300 Crown Colony Drive Suite 410
Quincy, MA 02169

noneill@mhtl.com
617-479-5000
Party name: Natick Public School District
Felicia Simone Vasudevan
    Counsel of Record
Murphy, Hesse, Toomey & Lehane, LLP
300 Crown Colony Drive, Suite 410
Quincy, MA 02169

fvasudevan@mhtl.com
6174795000
Party name: Natick Public Schools
Anna Rachel Dray-SiegelCommonwealth of Massachusetts - Office of the Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
20th Floor
Boston, MA 02108

AnnaRachel.Dray-Siegel@mass.gov
617-963-2022
Party name: Masssachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals