No. 19-227
Title:Adnan Syed, Petitioner
v.
Maryland
Docketed:August 21, 2019
Linked with 18A1320
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(24, September Term, 2018)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2019Application (18A1320) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 18, 2019 to August 19, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Application (18A1320) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 19, 2019.
Aug 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Adnan Syed.
Blanket Consent
Sep 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 20, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 21, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Martin Tankleff and Thirty-Eight Other Wrongfully Convicted Individuals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Network and The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375600
Party name: Adnan Syed
Attorneys for Respondent
Carrie J. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

cwilliams@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6422
Party name: State of Maryland
Other
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: The Innocence Network and The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHarrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Alexandra Margaret Walsh
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz LLP
2001 M Street NW, 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

awalsh@wilkinsonwalsh.com
2028474000
Party name: Martin Tankleff and Thirty-Eight Other Wrongfully Convicted Individuals