No. 19-223
Title:Janice Smyth, Petitioner
v.
Conservation Commission of Falmouth, et al.
Docketed:August 20, 2019
Linked with 19A88
Lower Ct:Appeals Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(2017-P-1189)
   Decision Date:February 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 9, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2019Application (19A88) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2019 to August 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main Document
Jul 25 2019Application (19A88) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until August 21, 2019.
Aug 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 19, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Sep 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 19, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 21, 2019.
Sep 09 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Janice Smyth.
Blanket Consent
Sep 17 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Southeastern Legal Foundation, Owners' Counsel of America.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Conservation Commission of Falmouth and Town of Falmouth.
Blanket Consent
Oct 21 2019Brief of respondents Conservation Commission of Falmouth and Town of Falmouth in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Reply of petitioner Janice Smyth filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. David Breemer
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jbreemer@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Janice Smyth
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Littleton
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Ave SE
Washington, DC 20003

matt@donahuegoldberg.com
2026836895
Party name: Conservation Commission of Falmouth and Town of Falmouth
Other
Cristen Alice Wohlgemuth
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cristen@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation and Cato Institute
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Southeastern Legal Foundation, Owners' Counsel of America