No. 19-220
Title:Lee Chatfield, et al., Appellants
v.
League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al.
Docketed:August 20, 2019
Linked with 18A1171, 18A1255
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(2:17-cv-14148)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2019Application (18A1171) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 13 2019Response to application (18A1171) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Monday, May 20 2019, by 3:00 p.m. ET.
May 20 2019Response to application from respondent Michigan Secretary of State filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2019Response of League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al. to application not accepted for filing. (May 20, 2019)
May 20 2019Response to application from respondents League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2019Response of League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al. to application not accepted for filing. (September 05, 2019)
May 21 2019Reply of applicants Lee Chatfield, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
May 24 2019Application (18A1171) referred to the Court.
May 24 2019Application (18A1171) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, case No. 2:17-CV-14148, entered April 25, 2019, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court or further order of this Court.
Jun 03 2019Application (18A1255) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from June 29, 2019 to August 15, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 05 2019Application (18A1255) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 15, 2019.
Aug 15 2019Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due September 19, 2019)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Letter of September 17, 2019 from counsel for appellees League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al. filed.
Main Document
Sep 19 2019Statement in response to jurisdictional statement from appellee Michigan Secretary of State filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 21 2019Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rucho v. Common Cause, 588 U.S. ___ (2019).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Lee Chatfield, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Michigan Secretary of State
Harmony Ann Mappes
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
300 N. Meridian Street, Suite 2500
Indianapolis, IN 46204

harmony.mappes@faegrebd.com
(317) 237-8246
Party name: League of Women Voters of Michigan, et al.