No. 19-211
Title:Time Warner Cable, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Docketed:August 19, 2019
Linked with 18A1232
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2247)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2019Application (18A1232) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 16, 2019 to August 15, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. (The Chief Justice is recused.)
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 31 2019Application (18A1232) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 15, 2019.
Aug 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2019 to September 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 25, 2019.
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief of respondent Sprint Communications Company, L.P. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 09 2019Reply of petitioners Time Warner Cable, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-389-5191
Party name: Time Warner Cable, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Michael Jakes
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, et al.
1300 I Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005-3315

mike.jakes@finnegan.com
202 408 4045
Party name: Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Other
William F. Lee
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

William.Lee@wilmerhale.com
617 526 6556
Party name: Intel Corporation