No. 19-205
Vide 19-350
Title:City of Flint, Michigan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Shari Guertin, et al.
Docketed:August 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1698, 17-1699, 17-1745, 17-1752, 17-1769)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2019 to November 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2019.
Oct 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2019 to December 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 16, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sheldon Howard Klein
    Counsel of Record
Butzel Long, a professional corporation
41000 Woodward Avenue, Stoneridge West Building
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

klein@butzel.com
2482581414
Party name: City of Flint, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul T. GeskeMcGuire Law, P.C.
55 W. Wacker Dr., 9th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

pgeske@mcgpc.com
312-893-7002
Party name: Shari Guertin, et al.