No. 19-199
Title:Manfredo M. Salinas, Petitioner
v.
United States Railroad Retirement Board
Docketed:August 15, 2019
Linked with 18A1192
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-60702)
   Decision Date:April 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2019Application (18A1192) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2019 to September 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 20 2019Application (18A1192) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 15, 2019.
Aug 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2019 to October 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 16, 2019.
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2019 to November 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 15, 2019.
Nov 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 9, 2019.
Dec 09 2019Brief of respondent United States Railroad Retirement Board in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 16 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 10 2020Petition GRANTED.
Feb 12 2020Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 12 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Manfredo Salinas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including April 1, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 8, 2020.
Feb 24 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Manfredo Salinas
Lisa Schiavo BlattWilliams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Manfredo Salinas
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Railroad Retirement Board