No. 19-19 | |
Title: | Sina Kianpour, Petitioner v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
Docketed: | July 1, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-55153) |
Decision Date: | February 21, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 23, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 22 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2019) |
Jul 08 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jul 17 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Sina Kianpour | 17412 Ventura Blvd., #117 Encino, CA 91316 | (818) 723-2281 |
Party name: Sina Kianpour | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Kerry William Franich Counsel of Record | Severson & Werson 19100 Von Karman Ave., Suite 700 Irvine, CA 92612 kwf@severson.com | 9494427110 |
Party name: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |