No. 19-177
Title:Agency for International Development, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-974, 17-2126)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2019 to November 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2019.
Nov 08 2019Brief of respondents Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Nov 26 2019Reply of petitioners United States Agency for Intrnational Development, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2019Petition GRANTED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jan 27 2020Brief of petitioners United States Agency for Intrnational Development, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 25, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Feb 20 2020Record of the USCA 2nd Circuit electronically received.
Feb 20 2020Record of the USDC Southern District of New York electronically received.
Feb 26 2020Brief of respondents Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Adventist Development and Relief Agency International filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of Public Health and Organizations Working in Public Health Policy and Implementation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2020Reply of petitioners Agency for International Development, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Agency for International Development, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David William Bowker
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

david.bowker@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6558
Party name: Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., et al.
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Professors of Public Health and Organizations Working in Public Health Policy and Implementation
Megan L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

MBrown@wiley.law
2027197000
Party name: The Cato Institute
Douglas Webber Dunham
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

douglas.dunham@dechert.com
2126983500
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Current and Former Members of Congress
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
350 S. Grand Ave. #2500
Los Angeles, CA 90071

evolokh@mayerbrown.com
310-206-3926
Party name: Adventist Development and Relief Agency International