No. 19-168
Title:Remington Arms Co., LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Donna L. Soto, Administratrix of the Estate of Victoria L. Soto, et al.
Docketed:August 5, 2019
Linked with 18A1185
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Connecticut
   Case Numbers:(SC 19832, SC 19833)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2019Application (18A1185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2019 to August 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2019Application (18A1185) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 1, 2019.
Aug 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 4, 2019 to October 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 4, 2019.
Sep 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National Rifle Association of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Two Members of the United States House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Shooting Sports Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word Count
Sep 04 2019Certificate of Service filed with respect to amicus curiae brief of Professors of Scond Amendment Law, et al.
Proof of Service
Sep 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief of respondents Donna L. Soto, Administratrix of the Estate of Victoria L. Soto, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: Remington Arms Co., LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004-1357

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: Donna L. Soto, Administratrix of the Estate of Victoria L. Soto, et al.
Other
Edgar Robert Haden
    Counsel of Record
Balch & Bingham LLP
1901 Sixth Avenue North
Suite 1500
Birmingham, AL 35203

ehaden@balch.com
205-251-8100
Party name: TWENTY-TWO MEMBERS OF THE UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: PROFESSORS OF SECOND AMENDMENT LAW, CATO INSTITUTE, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION, MADISON SOCIETY FOUNDATION, INDEPENDENCE INSTITUTE
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: STATES OF TEXAS, ALABAMA, ARKANSAS, GEORGIA, LOUISIANA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH DAKOTA, UTAH, AND WEST VIRGINIA, AND GOVERNOR PHIL BRYANT OF MISSISSIPPI
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: National Shooting Sports Foundation
John Parker Sweeney
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
1615 L Street NW
Suite 1350
Washington, DC 20036

jsweeney@bradley.com
202-393-7150
Party name: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.; Connecticut Citizens Defense League, Inc.
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.