No. 19-164
Title:David Samarripa, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gregory Kizziah, Warden, et al.
Docketed:August 5, 2019
Linked with 18A1158
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6048, 17-6260, 17-6166, 17-6213 ,17-6299, 17-6333)
   Decision Date:March 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 08 2019Application (18A1158) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 2, 2019 to August 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
May 09 2019Application (18A1158) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 1, 2019.
Aug 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 4, 2019 to October 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 4, 2019.
Sep 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Sixth Circuit Appointed Counsel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2019 to October 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 16, 2019.
Oct 16 2019Brief of respondents Gregory Kizziah, Warden, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Katherine Booth Wellington
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th St. NW
Washington, DC 20004

katherine.wellington@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5600
Party name: David Samarripa, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Gregory Kizziah, Warden, et al.
Other
William T. Russell Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
425 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10017-3954

wrussell@stblaw.com
2124552000
Party name: The Innocence Project, The National Association for Public Defense, California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, and Jarrett M. Adams
Louis A. Chaiten
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114

lachaiten@jonesday.com
216-586-7244
Party name: Sixth Circuit Appointed Counsel