No. 19-161
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam
Docketed:August 5, 2019
Linked with 18A1219
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55313)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2019Application (18A1219) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2019 to July 5, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 24 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
May 24 2019Application (18A1219) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 5, 2019.
Jun 25 2019Application (18A1219) to extend further the time from July 5, 2019 to August 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 26 2019Application (18A1219) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 4, 2019.
Aug 02 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Brief of respondent Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Sep 19 2019Reply of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 18 2019Petition GRANTED.
Oct 18 2019As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Oct 30 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 9, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Nov 26 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 2, 2020.
Dec 09 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 09 2019Proposal of petitioners to lodge copies of transcript hearing held before immigration judge on March 17, 2017, filed.
Main Document
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of The States of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Jan 09 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER with the exception of some SEALED documents that's electronic.
Jan 10 2020The record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of California is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of some SEALED documents that's electronic.
Jan 15 2020Brief of respondent Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020CIRCULATED
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Immigration Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Of Sri Lankan Politics filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Immigration and Human Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Law of Habeas Corpus filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Asylum Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Legal Historians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of International Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of The States of Illinois, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2020Reply of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Argued. For petitioners: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Lee Gelernt, New York, N. Y.
Mar 05 2020Lodging proposal of petitioners approved by the Clerk.
Mar 06 2020Lodging of petitioners consisting of a redacted transcript in related case filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 25 2020Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Gorsuch, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Breyer, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which Ginsburg, J., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kagan, J., joined.
Jul 27 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lee Gelernt
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad St.
New York, NY 10004-2400

lgelernt@aclu.org
2125492616
Party name: Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam
Other
Rusty Duane Crandell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rusty.Crandell@azag.gov
6025428540
Party name: The States of Arizona, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Indiana, Louisiana, Nebraska, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Texas
Curtis F. J. Doebbler
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Dr Curtis FJ Doebbler
159 West Drexel Avenue
San Antonio, TX 78210

cdoebbler@gmail.com
2107800054
Party name: International Lawyers
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Asylum Law Professors
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Noah Adam Levine
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

noah.levine@wilmerhale.com
212-230-8875
Party name: Scholars of the Law of Habeas Corpus
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8217
Party name: Immigration Scholars
Judy Perry Martinez Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Simon Peragine et al.
1100 Poydras Street
30th Floor, Energy Centre
New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Legal Historians
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: The States of Illinois, et al.
Matthew Eben Price
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MPrice@jenner.com
202-639-6873
Party name: Immigration and Human Rights Organizations
Anjali Srinivasan
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

asrinivasan@keker.com
415-391-5400
Party name: Professors Of Sri Lankan Politics
Kymberlee Claire Stapleton
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

kym.stapleton@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation