No. 19-16
Title:Allen E. Peithman, Jr., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:July 1, 2019
Linked with 18A1118
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2721, 17-2722, 17-2723, 17-2768)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2019Application (18A1118) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 28, 2019 to June 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 30 2019Application (18A1118) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until June 27, 2019.
Jun 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 31, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 30, 2019.
Aug 30 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8497
Party name: Allen Peithman, Jr., AEP Properties, L.L.C., Sharon A. Elder
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Cato Institute