No. 19-159
Title:Carlos Tapia, Petitioner
v.
New York
Docketed:August 2, 2019
Linked with 18A1339
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(19)
   Decision Date:April 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2019Application (18A1339) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2019 to July 31, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 19 2019Application (18A1339) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until July 31, 2019.
Jul 31 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 19 2019Response Requested. (Due September 18, 2019)
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2019 to November 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2019.
Oct 31 2019Brief of respondent New York in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Nov 15 2019Reply of petitioner Carlos Tapia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Adam Rubens
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 W 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

drubens@orrick.com
2125063679
Party name: Carlos Tapia
Attorneys for Respondent
David Andrew Slott
    Counsel of Record
Office of the District Attorney, Bronx County, New York
198 East 161 Street
Bronx, NY 10451

slottd@bronxda.nyc.gov
7188386298
Party name: New York
James Jiann WenOffice of the District Attorney, Bronx County
198 East 161st Street
Bronx, NY 10451

wenj@bronxda.nyc.gov
(718) 838-6669
Party name: New York