No. 19-152
Title:Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
International Trade Commission, et al.
Docketed:August 1, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1247, 18-114)
   Decision Date:May 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2019Motion of International Trade Commission, et al. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (August 28, 2019 - Corrected motion to be filed)
Aug 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 3, 2019 to October 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 3, 2019, for all respondents.
Sep 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2019 to November 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 4, 2019, for all respondents.
Oct 22 2019Letter of October 22, 2019 from counsel for petitioners filed.
Main Document
Nov 04 2019Brief of respondents International Trade Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 04 2019Brief of respondents Royal DSM NV, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Reply of Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Royal DSM NV, DSM Marine Lipids Peru S.A.C., DSM Nutritional Products, LLC, DSM Nutritional Products Canada, Inc., Pharmavite LLC
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: International Trade Commission, et al.
Other
Andrew Fred Pratt
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
600 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

AFPratt@Venable.com
2023444389
Party name: Nordic Naturals, Inc. and Nordic Pharma, Inc.