No. 19-1475
Title:Duke University, Petitioner
v.
Biomarin Pharmaceutical Inc.
Docketed:July 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1696)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 7, 2020 to October 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 6, 2020.
Oct 06 2020Brief of respondent BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 19 2020Reply of Duke University submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Alan Zalesin
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

sazalesin@pbwt.com
2123362000
Party name: Duke University
Attorneys for Respondent
Gerald Myers Murphy Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Birch, Stewart Kolasch & Birch, LLP
8110 Gatehouse Rd., Suite 100 East
Falls Church, VA 22042

gmm@bskb.com
703-205-8000
Party name: BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Gerald M. Murphy Jr.Birch Stewart Kolasch Birch, LLP
8110 Gatehouse Road, Suite 100E
Falls Church, VA 22042-1248

gmm@bskb.com
703-205-8020
Party name: BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc.