No. 19-1452
Vide 19-1434, 19-1458
Title:Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Arthrex, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2140)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Arthrex, Inc. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2020Memorandum of respondent United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 24 2020Response to petition from respondent Arthrex, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 14 2020Reply of petitioners Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition GRANTED, the petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1434 is granted as to Federal Circuit case No. 2018-2140, and the petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-1458 is granted, all limited to Questions 1 and 2 as set forth in the July 22, 2020 Memorandum for the United States. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Oct 13 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1434. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1434. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 23 2020Motion of United States to dispense with joint appendix submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Arthrex, Inc.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
2022201101
Party name: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC