No. 19-1447
Title:Yehudi Manzano, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3430)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 31, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 31, 2020 to August 31, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 31, 2020.
Jul 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, FAMM Foundation, and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2020 to September 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 30, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Norman A. Pattis
    Counsel of Record
Pattis & Smith, LLC
383 Orange St
New Haven, CT 06511

npattis@pattisandsmith.com
203-393-3017
Party name: Yehudi Manzano
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute, FAMM Foundation, and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers