No. 19-1442
Vide 20-105
Title:Willie Earl Carr, et al., Petitioners
v.
Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Docketed:July 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5079, 19-5085)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendix
Jun 29 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jul 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 31, 2020 to August 31, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Jul 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 31, 2020.
Aug 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2020 to September 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 30, 2020.
Sep 29 2020Brief of respondent Saul, Andrew M. filed.
Main Document
Oct 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 14 2020Reply of petitioners Willie Earl Carr, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 09 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-105 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Nov 09 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1442. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1442. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Nov 09 2020As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa Schiavo BlattWilliams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Willie Earl Carr, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Saul, Andrew M.