No. 19-1441
Title:City of Austin, Texas, Petitioner
v.
Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas, et al.
Docketed:June 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50646)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent Paxton, Att'y Gen. of TX to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 02 2020Response Requested. (Due October 2, 2020)
Sep 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2020 to December 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 1, 2020.
Nov 02 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner City of Austin, Texas filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Renea Hicks
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Max Renea Hicks
P.O. Box 303187
Austin, TX 78703

rhicks@renea-hicks.com
(512) 480-8231
Party name: City of Austin, Texas
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Paxton, Att'y Gen. of TX