No. 19-1440 | |
Title: | Melvin Ammons, et al., Petitioners v. Wisconsin Central, Ltd. |
Docketed: | June 30, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Illinois |
Case Numbers: | (124454) |
Decision Date: | December 19, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 27, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 25 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 30, 2020) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 13 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin Central, Ltd. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jul 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Jul 30 2020 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers-Transportation Division, et al. (Distributed) |
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document | |
Oct 05 2020 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers-Transportation Division, et al. GRANTED. |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
David E. Rapoport Counsel of Record | Rapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C. 20 N. Clark Suite 3500 Chicago, IL 60602 drapoport@rapoportlaw.com | 3123279880 |
Party name: Melvin Ammons, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Kevin Michael Forde Counsel of Record | Forde & O'Meara LLP 111 West Washington Street Suite 1100 Chicago, IL 60602 kforde@fordellp.com | 3126411441 |
Party name: Wisconsin Central, Ltd. | ||
Other | ||
Lawrence Moses Mann Counsel of Record | Alper & Mann, PC 9205 Redwood Avenue Bethesda, MD 20817 mann.larrym@gmail.com | 202-298-9191 |
Party name: Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, the Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineeers and Trainmen, and the Academy of Rail Lbor Attorneys |