No. 19-1434
Vide 19-1452, 19-1458
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Arthrex, Inc., et al.
Docketed:June 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2140)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2019
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Arthrex, Inc.VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Polaris Innovations Limited VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 23 2020Brief of respondents Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 24 2020Response to petition from respondent Arthrex, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Askeladden L.L.C. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of The New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020Petition GRANTED as to Federal Circuit case No. 2018-2140, and the petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 19-1452 and 19-1458 are granted, all limited to Questions 1 and 2 as set forth in the July 22, 2020 Memorandum for the United States. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Oct 13 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1434. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1434. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 21 2020Petitioners in Nos. 19-1434 and 19-1452 shall each file an opening brief, limited to 13,000 words, on or before Wednesday, November 25, 2020. Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners in Nos. 19-1434 or 19-1452, or in support of no party, shall be filed on or before Wednesday, December 2, 2020, and the briefs shall bear a light green cover. Petitioner in No. 19-1458 shall file a consolidated opening and response brief, limited to 17,000 words, on or before Wednesday, December 23, 2020. Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioner in No. 19-1458 shall be filed on or before Wednesday, December 30, 2020, and the briefs shall bear a dark green cover. Petitioners in Nos. 19-1434 and 19-1452 shall each file a consolidated response and reply brief, limited to 14,500 words, on or before Friday, January 22, 2021. Petitioner in No. 19-1458 shall file a reply brief, limited to 6,000 words, pursuant to Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court. VIDED.
Oct 23 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by the United States. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 29 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Arthrex, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 03 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States
Blanket Consent
Nov 09 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by the United States GRANTED. VIDED.
Nov 25 2020Opening brief of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 25 2020Opening brief of Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor John Harrison in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Acushnet Company and Roger Cleveland Golf Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Andrew Michaels in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Coalition Against Patent Abuse in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Cross-Industry Groups filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Unified Patents, LLC in support of neither party and of reversal filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corp. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Askeladden L.L.C. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Engine Advocacy and Electronic Frontier Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Administrative, Constitutional & Intellectual Property Law Professors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Amicus brief of Administrative, Constitutional & Intellectual Property Law Professors not accepted for filing. (Dupilicate submission) (December 07, 2020)
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Apple Inc. in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of High Tech Inventors Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Niskanen Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of eComp Consultants filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jason V. Morgan filed (in 19-1434).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 23 2020Brief of respondent Arthrex, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2020Brief amici curiae of 39 Aggrieved Inventors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of B.E. Technology, LLC filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of TiVo Corporation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Lumber Coalition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation and TechFreedom filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Amicus brief of New Civil Liberties Alliance not accepted for filing. (Corrected version to be submitted).
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed (Jan. 5, 2021). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of US Inventor, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and Prof. Gregory Dolin filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Fair Inventing Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Joshua J. Malone filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 1, 2021. VIDED.
Jan 11 2021Motion for divided argument filed by the Acting Solicitor General GRANTED. VIDED.
Jan 14 2021CIRCULATED
Jan 22 2021Consolidated reply and response brief filed by the United States. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 22 2021Consolidated response and reply of Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. for the Federal Circuit.
Feb 09 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 19 2021Reply of respondent Arthrex, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Argued. For United States: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.: Mark A. Perry, Washington, D. C. For Arthrex, Inc.: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Arthrex, Inc.
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Matthew D. Powers
    Counsel of Record
Tensegrity Law Group LLP
555 Twin Dolphin Dr.
Suite 650
Redwood Shores, CA 94065

matthew.powers@tensegritylawgroup.com
6508026000
Party name: Polaris Innovations Limited
Other
David Gabriel Bookbinder
    Counsel of Record
Niskanen Center
820 First Street, NE
Suite 675
Washington, DC 20002

dbookbinder@niskanencenter.org
301-751-0611
Party name: Niskanen Center
Peter J. Brann
    Counsel of Record
Brann & Isaacson
184 Main St.
P.O. Box 3070
Lewiston, ME 04243-3070

pbrann@brannlaw.com
207-557-8881
Party name: Acushnet Company and Roger Cleveland Golf Inc.
Peter J. Brann
    Counsel of Record
184 Main St.
P.O. Box 3070
Lewiston, ME 04243

pbrann@brannlaw.com
2075578881
Party name: Acushnet Company and Roger Cleveland Golf Company
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Apple Inc.
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
1801 Columbia Rd Ste 101
Washington, DC 20009

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
(202) 525-5717
Party name: Coalition Against Patent Abuse
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Boulevard
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

odunford@pacificlegal.org
916.503.9060
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Melvin C. Garner
    Counsel of Record
Leason Ellis LL P
One Barker Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601

Garner@Leasonellis.com
(914) 288-0022
Party name: The New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: US Inventor, Inc.
Timothy J. Haller
    Counsel of Record
Haller Law PLLC
230 E Delaware Pl, Ste 5E
Chicago, IL 60611

haller@haller-iplaw.com
630-336-4283
Party name: Joshua J. Malone
John Harrison
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

jh8m@virginia.edu
4349243093
Party name: Professor John Harrison
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
James M. Hood III
    Counsel of Record
Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

jhood@wmclaw.com
202-499-7900
Party name: B.E. Technology, LLC
William G. Jenks
    Counsel of Record
Jenks IP Law
1629 K St NW
Suite 300
washington, DC 20006

wjenks@jenksiplaw.com
2024127964
Party name: Unified Patents, LLC
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: TiVo Corporation
Joshua Stephen Landau
    Counsel of Record
Computer and Communications Industry Association
25 Massachusetts Ave
Suite 300C
Washington, DC 20001

jlandau@ccianet.org
202-783-0070 x116
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry Association; U.S. Manufacturers Association for Development and Enterprise
Gregory Hayes Lantier
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006

gregory.lantier@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Askeladden L.L.C.
John R Linzer
    Counsel of Record
Quarles & Brady, LLP
300 N. LaSalle St, Suite 4000
Chicago, IL 60654

john.linzer@quarles.com
312-715-5059
Party name: The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Charles Robert Macedo
    Counsel of Record
Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

cmacedo@arelaw.com
2123368000
Party name: eComp Consultants
Andrew Charles Michaels
    Counsel of Record
University of Houston Law Center
4604 Calhoun Road
Houston, TX 77204

acmichaels@uh.edu
(713) 743-6919
Party name: Professor Andrew Michaels
Jason V. Morgan
    Counsel of Record
2630 Skidmore Cir
Vienna, VA 22180

jvmorgan@gmail.com
14435384338
Party name: Jason V. Morgan
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Administrative, Constitutional & Intellectual Property Law Professors
Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
    Counsel of Record
Intellectual Property & Technology Law Clinic, University of Southern California Gould School of Law
699 Exposition Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90089

jef@law.usc.edu
(213) 740-7088
Party name: Engine Advocacy and Electronic Frontier Foundation
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation and TechFreedom
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: High Tech Inventors Alliance
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: U.S. Lumber Coalition
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute and Prof. Gregory Dolin
Mathew B. Tully
    Counsel of Record
Tully Rinckey PLLC
815 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 720
Washington, DC 20006

mtully@tullylegal.com
518-218-7100
Party name: Fair Inventing Fund
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Intel Corp.
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Cross-Industry Groups
Sophie Feifei Wang
    Counsel of Record
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
Two International Place
Boston, MA 02110

swang@choate.com
6172485000
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Kenneth James Weatherwax
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein & Weatherwax LLP
1880 Century Park East, Suite 815
Los Angeles, CA 90067

weatherwax@lowensteinweatherwax.com
310-307-4500
Party name: 39 AGGRIEVED INVENTORS