No. 19-1402
Vide 19-1411
Title:Antonio Jubis Zacarias, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ralph S. Janvey, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11073)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 21, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Antonio Zacarias, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Stanford Investors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Investors Advocate Bar Association filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2020Waiver of right of respondent Bowen, Miclette & Britt, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 04 2020Waiver of right of respondents Official Stanford Investors Committee; Samuel Troice; Manuel Canabal to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 04 2020Waiver of right of respondent Ralph S. Janvey to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 10 2020Response Requested. (Due October 13, 2020)
Oct 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2020 to November 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2020.
Oct 13 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Senators representing the state of Louisiana filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher J. King
    Counsel of Record
Homer Bonner PA
1441 Brickell Avenue
Suite 1200
Miami, FL 33131

cking@homerbonner.com
3053505192
Party name: Antonio Zacarias, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Bradley W. Foster
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
1445 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700
Dallas, TX 75202

bradfoster@huntonak.com
214-659-4646
Party name: Bowen, Miclette & Britt, Inc.
Peter Michael Jung
    Counsel of Record
Clark Hill Strasburger
901 Main Street
Suite 6000
Dallas, TX 75202

jungm@clarkhill.com
2146514724
Party name: Official Stanford Investors Committee; Samuel Troice; Manuel Canabal
Kevin Marshall Sadler
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
1001 Page Mill Road
Building One, Suite 200
Palo Alto, CA 94304

kevin.sadler@bakerbotts.com
6507397500
Party name: Ralph S. Janvey
Other
Royal B. Lea III
    Counsel of Record
Bingham and Lea, P.C.
319 Maverick Street
San Antonio, TX 78212

royal@binghamandlea.com
210-224-1819
Party name: Public Investors Advocate Bar Association
Perry R. Sanders Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Sanders Law Firm
31 North Tejon Street, Suite 400
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Slf@perrysanderslaw.com
(719) 630-1556
Party name: United States Senators representing the state of Louisiana
Gavin Douglas Schryver
    Counsel of Record
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019

GSchryver@kasowitz.com
(212)506-1891
Party name: Stanford Investors