No. 19-1401
Title:April Hughes, et al., Petitioners
v.
Northwestern University, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2569)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2020 to August 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2020.
Aug 24 2020Brief of respondents Northwestern University, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 09 2020Reply of petitioners April Hughes, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 08 2021Supplemental brief of respondents Northwestern University, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 10 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners April Hughes, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jul 22 2021Motion of April Hughes, et al. for an extension of time submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: April Hughes, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Craig C. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
300 N. LaSalle Dr. - 50th Floor
Chicago, IL 60654

cmartin@willkie.com
312-728-9000
Party name: Northwestern University, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States