No. 19-1398
Title:Ted Lieu, United States Congressman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Election Commission
Docketed:June 22, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5072)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 22, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ted Lieu, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Former FEC Commissioner, Ann M. Ravel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Senators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 22, 2020 to August 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Washington et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Christopher T. Robertson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Political Scientists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Amicus brief of Legal Scholars of Campaign Finance not accepted for filing. (July 31, 2020)(Corrected version submitted)
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Legal Scholars of Campaign Finance filed.(7/29/2020)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2020.
Aug 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2020 to September 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 21, 2020.
Sep 21 2020Brief of respondent Federal Election Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 24 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from October 7, 2020 to October 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until October 21, 2020 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Ted Lieu, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Election Commission
Other
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: Political Scientists
Stephanie Frederique Cagniart
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701

stephanie.cagniart@bakerbotts.com
(512) 322-2537
Party name: Ann M. Ravel
Nicolas Luis Martinez
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck LLP
54 W Hubbard St, Ste 300
Chicago, IL 60654

nicolas.martinez@bartlitbeck.com
3124944401
Party name: Legal Scholars of Campaign Finance
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, Patrick Leahy, Tom Udall, Richard Blumenthal, Mazie Hirono, and Chris Van Hollen
Russell B. Pierce Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Norman, Hanson & DeTroy
Two Canal Plaza
P.O. Box 4600
Portland, ME 04112

rpierce@nhdlaw.com
207-774-7000
Party name: Christopher T. Robertson, Kelly Bergstrand, and D. Alexander Winkelman
Noah Guzzo Purcell IV
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: States of Washington et al.