No. 19-1392
Title:Thomas E. Dobbs, State Health Officer of the Mississippi Department of Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al.
Docketed:June 18, 2020
Linked with 19A1027
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-60868)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2020Application (19A1027) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 16, 2020 to June 15, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Application (19A1027) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 15, 2020.
Jun 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2020 to August 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 19, 2020, for all respondents.
Jul 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Roman Catholic Diocese of Jackson and Roman Catholic Diocese of Biloxi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas Dobbs, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of 375 Women Injured By Second and Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Melinda Thybault, Individually and Acting on Behalf of 336,214 Signers of The Moral Outcry Petition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee and West Virginia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Illinois Right to Life filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Inner Life Fund and Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Amicus brief of Robin Pierucci, M.D., and Life Legal Defense Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020Brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 02 2020Reply of petitioners Thomas Dobbs, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 14 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Thomas Dobbs, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 26 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. filed (33.1 format).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 04 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 10 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 18 2020Rescheduled.
Nov 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 01 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 09 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
May 26 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 22, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 13, 2021.
Jun 09 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thomas Dobbs, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cleveland Lawyers for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Prolife Foundation, The Coalition for Jewish Values, Rabbi Yacov David Cohen, Rabbi Chananya Weissman, and Bonnie Chernin (President, Jewish Life League) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief of petitioners Thomas Dobbs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Jul 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief amici curiae of 375 Women Injured By Second And Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Abortion Recovery Leaders filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2021Brief amici curiae of National Right to Life Committee and Louisiana Right to Life Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Catholic Medical Association, National Association of Catholic Nurses-USA, Idaho Chooses Life and Texas Alliance for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of African American, Hispanic, Roman Catholic and Protestant Religious and Civil Rights Organizations and Leaders filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Senators Josh Hawley, Mike Lee, and Ted Cruz filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Trinity Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Melinda Thybault, Founder of The Moral Outcry Petition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops and Other Religious Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of LONANG Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of 22 State Policy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Connie Weiskopf and Kristine L. Brown filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Kurt T. Lash filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Robin Pierucci, M.D., and Life Legal Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Priests for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Amicus Curiae Hannah S., John S. and Marlene S filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of The Center for Medical Progress and David Daleiden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of European Legal Scholars in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of 396 State Legislators from 41 States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of 141 International Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mary Kay Bacallao Advocating for Unborn Children as Persons in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Randy Beck filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society and Robertson Center for Constitutional Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Religious Expression filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Family and Human Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Moral Law, Lutherans for Life filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Ethics and Public Policy Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pennsylvania Pro-Life Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Family Research Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Human Coalition Action and Students for Life of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Lee J. Strang filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Biologists in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Mary Ann Glendon and O. Carter Snead filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Monique Chireau Wubbenhorst, M.D., M.P.H., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Commissioner Andy Gipson, Former Representative and Chair of Mississippi House Judiciary B Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Care Net, a National Affiliation Organization of 1,200 Pregnancy Help Centers, and Alpha Center, a South Dakota Registered Pregnancy Help Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Reason for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Illinois Right to Life, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jonathan English filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Intercessors for America including its Intercessor Prayer Partners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of 228 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Governor Henry McMaster and Eleven Additional Governors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of The European Centre for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of National Catholic Bioethics Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Stephen G. Gilles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Jurisprudence John M. Finnis and Robert P. George filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of The American Cornerstone Institute and its founder Dr. Benjamin S. Carson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Democrats for Life of America Five Democratic Legislators from Five Individual State Legislatures filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Women Legislators, The Susan B. Anthony List filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Christian Medical & Dental Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. and the Charlotte Lozier Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of American College of Pediatricians and Association of American Physicians & Surgeons filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Heartbeat International, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Rep. Steve Carra and 320 State Legislators from 35 States filed.
OtherMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Foundation to Abolish Abortion, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of World Faith Foundation and Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of March for Life Education and Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Elliot Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Texas Right to Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice and Bioethics Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Amicus brief of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 03, 2021 - Correct service required; to be printed).
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Amicus brief of Pacific Justice Institute not accepted for filing. (August 03, 2021 - Correct service required; to be printed)
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Justice Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Amicus brief of Joseph W. Dellapenna not accepted for filing. (August 03, 2021 - Correct service required; to be printed)
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Joseph W. Dellapenna filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amici curiae of 240 Women Scholars and Professionals, and Prolife Feminist Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Good Counsel, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2021Amicus brief of 240 Women Scholars and Professionals, and Prolife Feminist Organizations submitted.
Sep 13 2021Brief of respondents Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Hawks filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Experts, Researchers, and Advocates Opposing the Criminalization of People Who Have Abortions filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Advocates for Youth, Inc. and Neo Philanthropy, Inc. d/b/a We Testify filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Brief amici curiae of The Freedom From Religion Foundation, Center for Inquiry, and American Atheists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Cecilia Fire Thunder; et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 1, 2021.
Sep 20 2021Amicus brief of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. not accepted for filing. (September 21, 2021) (corrected efiling to be submitted)
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 20 2021Amicus brief of National Advocates for Pregnant Women, et al. not accepted for filing. (September 21, 2021 - corrected brief to be printed and submitted)
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of National Advocates for Pregnant Women, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, American Humanist Association, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, and Interfaith Alliance Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Court Procedure filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Yale Law School Information Society Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of National Asian Pacific American Women’s Forum, Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, and Organizations Representing the Interests of Asian American and Pacific Islander Women filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Reproductive Justice Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Local Governments filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Catholics for Choice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Campaña Nacional por el Aborto Libre, Seguro y Accesible and other Puerto Rican Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The Autistic Self Advocacy Network and The Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Birth Equity Organizations and Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union and The American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Organizations of Women Lawyers-Women Lawyers on Guard Inc., Women’s Bar Association of the District of Columbia and National Association of Women Lawyers et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Social Science Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Economists filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Lee C. Bollinger, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Abortion Care Network, Bixby Center for Global Reproductive Health, Medical Students for Choice, National Abortion Federation, Physicians for Reproductive Health and Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of American Historical Association and Organization of American Historians filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of LGBTQ Organizations filed. (9/24/21 - Corrected brief to be reprinted and submitted).
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of LGBTQ Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of International and Comparative Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Equal Protection Constitutional Law Scholars Serena Mayeri, Melissa Murray, and Reva Siegel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Organizations Dedicated to the Fight for Reproductive Justice Mississippi in Action, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of European Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of States of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of International Federation of Gynecology and Obstetrics filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of YWCA USA, Girls Inc., Supermajority Education Fund, and United State of Women filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of United Nations Mandate Holders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Watch, Global Justice Center, and Amnesty International filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of California Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Scott Pyles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Over 500 Women Athletes, The Women’s National Basketball Players Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Voice, Asian Pacific Institute On Gender-based Violence, et at. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Feminist Majority Foundation, Abortion Access Front, C.A. Goldberg, PLLC, The National Organization For Women Foundation, The Southern Poverty Law Center, We Engage, Professor David S. Cohen, and Krysten Connon filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of 236 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of 547 Deans, Chairs, Scholars, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of 896 State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of American Society for Legal History and Other Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Abortion Funds and Practical Support Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Oct 04 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Oct 12 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Oct 13 2021Reply of petitioners Thomas Dobbs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021The time for oral argument is allotted as follows: 35 minutes for petitioners, 20 minutes for respondents, and 15 minutes for the Acting Solicitor General.
Oct 19 2021Motion of Amicus Hannah S. for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument as Amicus Curiae and for Enlargement of Time for Oral Argument of Amicus Curiae Hannah S., John S. and Marlene S submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott Grant Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

scott.stewart@ago.ms.gov
(601) 359-5563
Party name: Thomas Dobbs, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Hillary Anne Schneller
    Counsel of Record
Center for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10038

hschneller@reprorights.org
(917) 637-3777
Party name: Jackson Women's Health Organization, et al.
Other
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
2526732282
Party name: 228 Members of Congress
Brigitte Adrienne Amiri
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2427

bamiri@aclu.org
2125197897
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union and The American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Organizations Dedicated to the Fight for Reproductive Justice Mississippi in Action, et al.
David A. Barrett
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001

dbarrett@bsfllp.com
212-446-2300
Party name: Over 500 Women Athletes, The Women’s National Basketball Players Association, et al.
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Women Legislators and The Susan B. Anthony List
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Right to Life Committee and Louisiana Right to Life Federation
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Kristine Lee Brown
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
8700 E Jefferson Ave #371703
Denver, CO 80237

kristi@kristiburtonbrown.com
302-515-2721
Party name: Connie Weiskopf and Kristine L. Brown
Mary Jane Browning
    Counsel of Record
MaryBrowning, LLC
214 Cherry Street
Jefferson, MO 65101

mary@maryjbrowninglaw.com
5732306945
Party name: Amicus Curiae Hannah S., John S. and Marlene S
Leah R. Bruno
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
233 South Wacker Drive
Suite 5900
Chicago, IL 60606

leah.bruno@dentons.com
312-876-8000
Party name: Social Science Experts
Renee Kristine Carlson
    Counsel of Record
True North Legal
2855 Anthony Lane South
Minneapolis, MN 55418

rcarlson@truenorthlegalmn.org
6127898811
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.; Minnesota Family Council; Center for Political Renewal; The Family Leader (Iowa); Family Heritage Alliance; and Nebraska Family Alliance
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Harold J. Cassidy
    Counsel of Record
The Cassidy Law Firm
750 Broad Street
Suite 3
Shrewsbury, NJ 07702

hjc@haroldcassidy.com
7327473999
Party name: Care Net, a National Affiliation Organization of 1,200 Pregnancy Help Centers, and Alpha Center, a South Dakota Registered Pregnancy Help Center
Kim Christensen Clark
    Counsel of Record
Legal Voice
907 Pine Street, Suite 500
Seattle, WA 98101

kclark@legalvoice.org
16026258896
Party name: Legal Voice, Asian Pacific Institute On Gender-based Violence, et at.,
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Pacific Justice Institute
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Joseph W. Dellapenna
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society and Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
University of St. Thomas School of Law
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55403

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
2189 Sargent Avenue
Saint Paul, MN 55105

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: 240 Women Scholars and Professionals, and Prolife Feminist Organizations
Sean Richard Collier
    Counsel of Record
Collier Legal, LLC
12 Granary Road
Stockton, NJ 08559

sean.collier@gmail.com
9085817180
Party name: Good Counsel, Inc.
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Ethics and Public Policy Center
Carolyn Frances Corwin
    Counsel of Record
Covington and Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

ccorwin@cov.com
202-662-5338
Party name: Birth Equity Organizations and Scholars
Meredith Leigh Di Liberto
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street SW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20024

mdiliberto@judicialwatch.org
2026465172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Mario Alberto Diaz
    Counsel of Record
Concerned Women for America
1000 N. Payne St.
Alexandria, VA 22314

mdiaz@cwfa.org
2024887000
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Farah Christina Diaz-Tello
    Counsel of Record
If/When/How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice
1714 Franklin Street #100-393
Oakland, CA 94612

farah@ifwhenhow.org
347-974-7337
Party name: Experts, Researchers, and Advocates Opposing the Criminalization of People Who Have Abortions
Lynn Downey Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Lynn D. Dowd
29 W Benton Ave
Naperville, IL 60540

ldowd@msn.com
6306657851
Party name: Biologists
Lael Ruth Echo-Hawk
    Counsel of Record
MThirtysix PLLC
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
2nd FL – The Yard
Washington, DC 20003

lael@mthirtysixpllc.com
(206) 271-0106
Party name: Cecilia Fire Thunder; National Indigenous Women’s Resource Center; the Native American Community Board; and Additional Advocacy Organizations and Individuals
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law, Lutherans for Life
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: American Historical Association and Organization of American Historians
Jonathan English
    Counsel of Record
451 7th Street SW
Washington, DC 20410

jenglish2@gmail.com
202-469-0116
Party name: Jonathan English
Brian James Field
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Jaffe
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

bfield@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: European Legal Scholars
Clarke David Forsythe
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

clarke.forsythe@aul.org
3122854568
Party name: Americans United for Life
David F. Forte
    Counsel of Record
Cleveland-Marshall College of Law, Cleveland State University
1801 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44115

d.forte@csuohio.edu
216 403-3298
Party name: Cleveland Lawyers for Life
Catherine M. Foti
    Counsel of Record
Morvillo, Abramowitz, et al.
565 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10017

cfoti@maglaw.com
212-856-9600
Party name: American Society for Legal History and Other Scholars
Alexis Irene Fragosa
    Counsel of Record
Center for Family and Human Rights
776 Walker Road, Suite E
Great Falls, VA 22066

iyc@c-fam.org
6262410594
Party name: Center for Family and Human Rights
John Arak Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Mass. Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

John.Freedman@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5316
Party name: 236 Members of Congress
Gary N. Frischling
    Counsel of Record
Milbank LLP
2029 Century Park East
33rd Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

gfrischling@milbank.com
424-386-4316
Party name: Reproductive Justice Scholars
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Eugene Martin Gelernter
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

emgelernter@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: Catholics for Choice, et al.
Robert P. George
    Counsel of Record
Robinson & McElwee, PLLC
700 Virginia Street East, Suite 400
Charleston, WV 25301

rgeorge@princeton.edu
6096584510
Party name: Scholars of Jurisprudence John M. Finnis and Robert P. George
Adam Scott Gershenson
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
500 Boylston Street, 14th Floor
Boston, MA 02116

agershenson@cooley.com
(617) 937-2379
Party name: International Federation of Gynecology and Obstetrics
Stephen Gilles
    Counsel of Record
Quinnipiac University School of Law
275 Mount Carmel Ave.
Hamden, CT 06518

stephen.gerard.gilles@gmail.com
8609928130
Party name: Professor Stephen G. Gilles
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Samuel David Green
    Counsel of Record
Reason for Life
P.O. Box 500040
Palmdale, CA 93550

sgreen@reasonforlife.org
(661) 524-5770
Party name: Reason for Life
Jon M. Greenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, NW
9th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
202-662-8315
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; et al.
Matthew Edwin Gronda
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
P.O. Box 70
Saint Charles, MI 48655

matt@matthewgronda.com
989-249-0350
Party name: Rep. Steve Carra and 320 State Legislators from 35 States
Mia Tobin Guizzetti Hayes
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mhayes@willkie.com
202-303-1197
Party name: Organizations of Women Lawyers-Women Lawyers on Guard Inc., Women’s Bar Association of the District of Columbia and National Association of Women Lawyers et al.
Heather Gebelin Hacker
    Counsel of Record
Hacker Stephens LLP
108 Wild Basin Rd
Suite 250
Austin, TX 78746

heather@hackerstephens.com
512-399-3022
Party name: Professors Mary Ann Glendon and O. Carter Snead
Heather Gebelin Hacker
    Counsel of Record
Hacker Stephens LLP
108 Wild Basin Rd
Suite 250
Austin, TX 78746

heather@hackerstephens.com
512-399-3022
Party name: Monique Chireau Wubbenhorst, M.D., M.P.H., et al.
John Edward Hall
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

jhall@cov.com
2026626000
Party name: Feminist Majority Foundation, Abortion Access Front, C.A. Goldberg, PLLC, The National Organization For Women Foundation, The Southern Poverty Law Center, We Engage, Professor David S. Cohen, and Krysten Connon
Erica Worth Harris
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey, LLP
1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77002-5096

eharris@susmangodfrey.com
7136519366
Party name: Advocates for Youth, Inc. and Neo Philanthropy, Inc. d/b/a We Testify
Joshua David Hawley
    Counsel of Record
N/A
115 Russell Senate Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20510

ellen_james@hawley.senate.gov
202-224-6154
Party name: Senators Josh Hawley, Mike Lee, and Ted Cruz
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive, Suite 101
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-283-8880
Party name: World Faith Foundation and Institute for Faith and Family
Helen H. Hong
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of Solicitor General
600 West Broadway Street, Suite 1805
San Diego, CA 92101

helen.hong@doj.ca.gov
6197389693
Party name: States of California, et al.
Roberta A. Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, 63rd Floor
New York, NY 10118

rkaplan@kaplanhecker.com
2127630883
Party name: Equal Protection Constitutional Law Scholars Serena Mayeri, Melissa Murray, and Reva Siegel
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: California Women's Law Center
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, N.W.
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
202-466-3234
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State, American Humanist Association, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, and Interfaith Alliance Foundation
Nathan W. Kellum
    Counsel of Record
Center for Religious Expression
699 Oakleaf Office Lane
Suite 107
Memphis, TN 38117

nkellum@crelaw.org
9016845485
Party name: Center for Religious Expression
Antony B. Kolenc
    Counsel of Record
106 S Harwood St
Dallas, TX 75201

antony.kolenc@untdallas.edu
2142431781
Party name: 141 International Legal Scholars
William Grayson Lambert
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor
South Carolina State House
1100 Gervais Street
Columbia, SC 29201

glambert@governor.sc.gov
8037342100
Party name: Governor Henry McMaster and Eleven Additional Governors
Stephen C. Leckar
    Counsel of Record
Kalbain Hagerty LLP
888 17th Street. NW
Twelfth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sleckar@kalbianhagerty.com
(202) 223-5600
Party name: Anthony Hawks
Jonathan Philip Lienhard
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Highway
Haymarket, VA 20169

jlienhard@holtzmanvogel.com
15403418808
Party name: March for Life Education and Defense Fund
Emma Lindsay
    Counsel of Record
Withers Bergman LLP
430 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022

emma.lindsay@withersworldwide.com
212-848-9883
Party name: United Nations Mandate Holders
Paul Benjamin Linton
    Counsel of Record
921 Keystone Avenue
Northbrook, IL 60062

pblconlaw@aol.com
8472913848
Party name: Thomas More Society
George Lester Lyon Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Lukas, Nace, Gutierrez & Sachs, Chartered
1929 Biltmore Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

GLYON@FCCLAW.COM
202-669-0442
Party name: Mary Kay Bacallao Advocating for Unborn Children as Persons
Janice Marie Mac Avoy
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
0ne New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

janice.macavoy@friedfrank.com
212-859-8182
Party name: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Royal College of Obstetricians and Gynaecologists, U.S. Association for the Study of Pain, and 27 Scientific and Medical Experts
Rebecca Susan Markert
    Counsel of Record
Freedom form Religion Foundation
P.O. Box 750
Madison, WI 53701

rmarkert@ffrf.org
(608) 256-8900
Party name: The Freedom From Religion Foundation, Center for Inquiry, and American Atheists
John P. Mastando III
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

john.mastando@weil.com
2123108064
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, et al.,
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: Scholars of Court Procedure
Deanne Elizabeth Maynard
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

dmaynard@mofo.com
202-887-8740
Party name: LGBTQ Organizations
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Family Research Council
Julian Lenwood McPhillips Jr.
    Counsel of Record
McPhillips Shinbaum, LLP
516 S Perry St
Montgomery, AL 36104

julianmcphillips@icloud.com
3342621911
Party name: Democrats for Life of America Five Democratic Legislators from Five Individual State Legislatures
Patrick Michael McSweeney
    Counsel of Record
McSweeney, Cynkar & Kachouroff, PLLC
3358 John Tree Hill Rd
Powhatan, VA 23139

patrick@mck-lawyers.com
7036213300
Party name: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Hiram Alberto Melendez-Juarbe
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 193063
San Juan, PR 00919-3063

hiram@melendezjuarbe.com
787-415-5192
Party name: Campaña Nacional por el Aborto Libre, Seguro y Accesible and other Puerto Rican Organizations
Jonathan B. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
4096 Piedmont Avenue, #149
Oakland, CA 94611

jon@publicrightsproject.org
6468316113
Party name: Local Governments
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
1050 Johnnie Dodds Blvd. #83
Mt. Pleasant, SC 29465

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: American College of Pediatricians and Association of American Physicians & Surgeons
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Texas Right to Life
Kerry Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Kerry L. Morgan
2915 Biddle Avenue
Suite 200
Wyandotte, MI 48192

kmorgan@pck-law.com
(734) 281-7100
Party name: LONANG Institute
Robert Joseph Muise
    Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
PO Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI 48113

rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
7346353756
Party name: Priests for Life
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
4250 N. Fairfax Dr.
Suite 600
Arlington, VA 22203

anichols@charislex.com
571-549-2645
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Thomas Gerald Olp
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tolp@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Illinois Right to Life, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Intercessors for America including its Intercessor Prayer Partners
Lynn Mara Paltrow
    Counsel of Record
National Advocates for Pregnant Women
575 8th Avenue, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10018

LMP@advocatesforpregnantwomen.org
212-255-9252
Party name: National Advocates for Pregnant Women, et al.
Robert M. Palumbos
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rmpalumbos@duanemorris.com
(215) 979-1000
Party name: National Asian Pacific American Women’s Forum, Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, and Organizations Representing the Interests of Asian American and Pacific Islander Women
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: Jewish Prolife Foundation, The Coalition for Jewish Values, Rabbi Yacov David Cohen, Rabbi Chananya Weissman, and Bonnie Chernin (President, Jewish Life League)
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: 375 Women Injured By Second And Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Abortion Recovery Leaders
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: Melinda Thybault, Founder of The Moral Outcry Petition, et al.
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Drive
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: 375 Women Injured By Second and Third Trimester Late Term Abortions and Melinda Thybault, Individually and Acting on Behalf of 336,214 Signers of The Moral Outcry Petition
Kimberly A. Parker
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering
2445 M St., NW.
Washington, DC 20037

kimberly.parker@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6987
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, et al.
Anthony Richard Picarello Jr.
    Counsel of Record
United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Office of General Counsel
3211 4th Street, NE
Washignton, DC 20017

apicarello@usccb.org
202-541-3311
Party name: U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops and Other Religious Organizations
Bradley Wayne Pierce
    Counsel of Record
Foundation to Abolish Abortion
P.O. Box 402
Liberty Hill, TX 78642

bpierce@abolishabortiontx.org
(512) 598-1092
Party name: Foundation to Abolish Abortion, et al
Gary Scott Pyles
    Counsel of Record
2364 Essington Rd, Box 373
Joliet, IL 60435

spyles081@gmail.com
8153422856
Party name: Scott Pyles
Maura Katherine Quinlan
    Counsel of Record
38 Golfview Road
Camp Hill, PA 17011

maurakquinlan@outlook.com
717-460-8565
Party name: Catholic Medical Association, National Association of Catholic Nurses-USA, Idaho Chooses Life and Texas Alliance for Life
Maura Katherine Quinlan
    Counsel of Record
38 Golfview Road
Camp Hill, PA 17011

maurakquinlan@outlook.com
717-460-8565
Party name: Pennsylvania Pro-Life Federation
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Abortion Care Network, Bixby Center for Global Reproductive Health, Medical Students for Choice, National Abortion Federation, Physicians for Reproductive Health and Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc.
D. Kent Safriet
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Highway
Haymarket, VA 20169

kent@holtzmanvogel.com
(540) 341-8808
Party name: Christian Medical & Dental Associations
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Maureen L. Condic, Ph.D. and the Charlotte Lozier Institute
Elizabeth Brooks Scherer
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 27525
Raleigh, NC 27611

scherer.appeals@gmail.com
919.755.8790
Party name: Professor Randy Beck
Linda Boston Schlueter
    Counsel of Record
Trinity Legal Center
1150 N. Loop 1604 W.
Suite 108-208
San Antonio, TX 78248

TLC4Linda@aol.com
210-274-5274
Party name: Trinity Legal Center
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: Elliot Institute
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
20225468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice and Bioethics Defense Fund
Jordan Adam Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, NE
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow.jas@aclj.org
202-546-8890
Party name: The European Centre for Law and Justice
Shannon Rose Selden
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 3rd Avenue
New York, NY 10022

srselden@debevoise.com
212-909-6000
Party name: International and Comparative Legal Scholars
Jeffrey A. Shafer
    Counsel of Record
Langdon Law LLC
8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Rd.
West Chester, OH 45069

jshafer@langdonlaw.com
513-577-7380
Party name: 396 State Legislators from 41 States
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Robin Pierucci, M.D., and Life Legal Defense Foundation
Heather Dorothy Shumaker
    Counsel of Record
National Women's Law Center
11 Dupont Cir Nw
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20036

hshumaker@nwlc.org
202-588-5180
Party name: National Women's Law Center and 72 Additional Organizations Committed to Gender Equality
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 Virginia Ave NW
Apt C619
Washington, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
954-328-9461
Party name: Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty
J. Thomas Smith Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Government Defense Fund
1113 Murfreesboro Road
106-167
Franklin, TN 37064

jthomsmith@cgdfund.com
202-669-1452
Party name: 22 State Policy Organizations
Priscilla J. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
319 Sterling Place
18th Floor
Brooklyn, NY 11238

priscilla.smith@yale.edu
3472625177
Party name: Yale Law School Information Society Project
William Lucien Smith
    Counsel of Record
Balch & Bingham LLP
188 East Capitol Street, Suite 1400
Jackson, MS 39201

bsmith@balch.com
6019658175
Party name: Commissioner Andy Gipson, et al.
Orin Samuel Snyder
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLp
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

osnyder@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Lee C. Bollinger, et al.,
Anjali Srinivasan
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

asrinivasan@keker.com
415-391-5400
Party name: Economists
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: African American, Hispanic, Roman Catholic and Protestant Religious and Civil Rights Organizations and Leaders
Simon Arthur Steel
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

simon.steel@dentons.com
2029776249
Party name: European Law Professors
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.,
Christian Janet Strickland
    Counsel of Record
Schwartz, Orgler & Jordan, PLLC
2355 Pass Road
Biloxi, MS 39531

christian@sojlaw.net
228-388-7441
Party name: Roman Catholic Diocese of Jackson and Roman Catholic Diocese of Biloxi
Claude G. Szyfer
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

cszyfer@stroock.com
(212) 806-5400
Party name: 896 State Legislators
Stephanie Toti
    Counsel of Record
Lawyering Project
41 Schermerhorn Street
No. 1056
New York, NY 11201

stoti@lawyeringproject.org
(646) 490-1083
Party name: Abortion Funds and Practical Support Organizations
Reginald M. Turner Jr.
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 North Clark St.
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
3129885000
Party name: American Bar Association
Angela C. Vigil
    Counsel of Record
Baker and McKenzie LLP
1111 Brickell Avenue
Suite 1700
Miami, FL 33131

angela.vigil@bakermckenzie.com
305-789-8904
Party name: Ywca USA, Girls Inc., Supermajority Education Fund, and United State of Women
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Upper Level
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-643-1765
Party name: National Catholic Bioethics Center, et al.
Kevin Christian Walsh
    Counsel of Record
University of Richmond School of Law
203 Richmond Way
Richmond, VA 23173

kwalsh@richmond.edu
804-287-6018
Party name: Professor Kurt T. Lash
Xiao Wang
    Counsel of Record
Northwestern University Pritzker School of Law
375 E. Chicago Avenue, 8th Floor
Chicago, IL 60611

x.wang@law.northwestern.edu
3125031486
Party name: Human Rights Watch, Global Justice Center, and Amnesty International
Edward Todd Waters
    Counsel of Record
Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP
1129 20th Street, NW.
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

ewaters@feldesmantucker.com
202 466 8960
Party name: 547 Deans, Chairs, Scholars, et al.
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street NW
Suite 643-A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@holtzmanvogel.com
2027378808
Party name: The American Cornerstone Institute and its founder Dr. Benjamin S. Carson
Danielle Merry White
    Counsel of Record
Heartbeat International, Inc.
5000 Arlington Centre Blvd., Suite 2277
Columbus, OH 43220

dwhite@heartbeatinternational.org
6148857577
Party name: Heartbeat International, Inc.
Philip Daniel Williamson
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

pwilliamson@taftlaw.com
5133579417
Party name: Lee J. Strang
Tiffany Regina Wright
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic
2900 Van Ness Street NW
Washington, DC 20008

tiffany.wright@orrick.com
202-643-7204
Party name: Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic
Geoffrey M. Wyatt
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

geoffrey.wyatt@skadden.com
202-371-7008
Party name: The Autistic Self Advocacy Network and The Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
Chelsey Danaye Youman
    Counsel of Record
Human Coalition Action
P.O. Box 5052
Frisco, TX 75035

cyouman@hucoaction.org
2146294806
Party name: Human Coalition Action and Students for Life of America