No. 19-1385
Title:Kristina Box, Commissioner, Indiana Department of Health, Petitioner
v.
Ashlee Henderson, et al.
Docketed:June 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1141)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent Ashlee and Ruby Henderson, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 28 2020Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020)
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to November 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 10, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Kristina Box, In Her Official Capacity as Commissioner, Indiana State Department of Health
Attorneys for Respondents
Karen Celestino-Horseman
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Karen Celestino-Horseman
22 E Washington St
Suite 620
Indianapolis, IN 46204

karen@kchorseman.com
3176325633
Party name: Ashlee and Ruby Henderson, et al.