No. 19-1382
Title:Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Laryssa Jock, et al.
Docketed:June 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-153)
   Decision Date:November 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 16, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2020 to August 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 17, 2020.
Jul 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2020Brief of respondents Laryssa Jock, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2020Reply of petitioner Sterling Jewelers, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7000
Party name: Sterling Jewelers, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph Marc Sellers
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll
1100 New York Ave., N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jsellers@cohenmilstein.com
2024084648
Party name: Laryssa Jock, et al.
Other
Michael John Eastman
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW
#1000
Washington, DC 20005

meastman@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and National Retail Federation