No. 19-1380
Title:Terry Lynn Olson, Petitioner
v.
Janis Amatuzio, et al.
Docketed:June 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3084)
   Decision Date:January 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2020Brief of respondents Paul Schnell, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2020Brief of respondent Janis Amatuzio in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2020Reply of petitioner Terry Lynn Olson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erica Ashley Holzer
    Counsel of Record
Maslon LLP
3300 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

erica.holzer@maslon.com
6126728387
Party name: Terry Lynn Olson
Attorneys for Respondents
Angela Behrens
    Counsel of Record
Minnesota Attorney General's Office
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1400
St. Paul, MN 55101

angela.behrens@ag.state.mn.us
6517571204
Party name: Paul Schnell, Tom Roy, and Joan Fabian
Cecilie Morris Loidolt
    Counsel of Record
Arthur Chapman Kettering Smetak & Pikala, P.A.
500 Young Quinlan Building
81 South Ninth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

cmloidolt@arthurchapman.com
612-339-3500
Party name: Janis Amatuzio