No. 19-1368
Title:Walmart Stores, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, et al.
Docketed:June 12, 2020
Linked with 19A1013
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50299)
   Decision Date:December 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2020Application (19A1013) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 13 2020Application (19A1013) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 6, 2020.
Jun 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2020Letter pursuant to Rule 35.3 from counsel for respondents submitted.
Main Document
Jun 16 2020Waiver of right of respondents Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 16 2020Waiver of right of respondent Texas Package Stores Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. Distributed
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2020Response Requested. (Due August 21, 2020)
Jul 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2020 to October 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 20, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, et al.
Greg Alan Waldrop
    Counsel of Record
Terrill & Waldrop
810 West 10th Street
Austin, TX 78701

awaldrop@terrillwaldrop.com
(512) 474-9100
Party name: Texas Package Stores Association
Other
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute