No. 19-1365
Title:Ramon Hueso, Petitioner
v.
J. A. Barnhart, Warden
Docketed:June 12, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6299)
   Decision Date:January 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to August 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2020.
Jul 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2020 to September 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 11, 2020.
Sep 11 2020Brief of respondent J. A. Barnhart, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 17 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from September 30, 2020 to October 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 22 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until October 28, 2020 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Marie Konsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block Supreme Court and Appellate Clinic
University of Chicago Law School
1111 E. 60th Street
Chicago, IL 60637

konsky@uchicago.edu
773-834-3190
Party name: Ramon Hueso
Matthew S. HellmanJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Ramon Hueso
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: J. A. Barnhart, Warden