No. 19-1362
Title:Jason Laut, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 11, 2020
Linked with 19A1012
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2843)
   Decision Date:December 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2020Application (19A1012) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 8, 2020 to May 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 16 2020Application (19A1012) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until May 8, 2020.
Jun 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to August 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2020.
Aug 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2020 to September 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 11, 2020.
Aug 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 11, 2020 to October 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 13, 2020. See Rule 30.1.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Christopher Korevec
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
555 South Flower Street, Suite 3700
Los Angeles, CA 90071

john.korevec@kirkland.com
213-680-8343
Party name: Jason Laut
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States