No. 19-1361 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Richard Jordan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Georgia Department of Corrections
Docketed:June 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12948)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to August 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2020.
Aug 11 2020Brief of respondent Georgia Department of Corrections in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 26, 2020 to September 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 18 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until September 9, 2020 granted.
Sep 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 09 2020Reply of petitioners Richard Jordan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
777 6th St. NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Richard Jordan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-651-9453
Party name: Georgia Department of Corrections