No. 19-1357
Title:Robert Angel Perez, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:June 11, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(16CA1180)
   Decision Date:June 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 24, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Robert A. Perez
Blanket Consent
Jul 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to September 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 11, 2020.
Jul 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kendall Kelly Alexis Turner
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

kendallturner@omm.com
7036061934
Party name: Robert A. Perez
Attorneys for Respondent
L. Andrew Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203

andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: Colorado
Other
Benjamin Paul Chagnon
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

bchagnon@orrick.com
202-339-8669
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center