No. 19-1351 | |
Title: | Ameranth, Inc., Petitioner v. Domino's Pizza, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | June 9, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1141, 2019-1144) |
Decision Date: | November 1, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 6, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 03 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 9, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 12 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Domino's Pizza, LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 17 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Aug 26 2020 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Ameranth, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried Counsel of Record | Ganzfried Law 5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440 Washington, DC 20015 JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com | 202-486-2004 |
Party name: Ameranth, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Frank A. Angileri Counsel of Record | Brooks Kushman P.C. 1000 Town Center 22nd Floor Southfield, MI 48075 fangileri@brookskushman.com | 2483584400 |
Party name: Domino's Pizza, LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc. |