No. 19-1339
Title:Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., et al., Petitioners
v.
Aaron Senne, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:June 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16245, 17-16267, 17-16276)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2020Waiver of right of respondents Aaron Senne, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 11 2020Response Requested. (Due July 13, 2020)
Jul 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 13, 2020 to August 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2020.
Aug 12 2020Brief of respondents Aaron Senne, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 26, 2020 to September 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 18 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until September 2, 2020 granted.
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 02 2020Reply of petitioners Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Kansas City Royals Baseball Corp., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert L. King
    Counsel of Record
Korein Tillery LLC
505 North 7th Street
Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO 63101

rking@koreintillery.com
3142414844
Party name: Aaron Senne, et al.