No. 19-1336
Title:The National Retirement Fund, et al., Petitioners
v.
Metz Culinary Management, Inc.
Docketed:June 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1211)
   Decision Date:January 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jun 05 2020Waiver of right of respondent Metz Culinary Management, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2020Response Requested. (Due July 17, 2020)
Jul 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 17, 2020 to August 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 17, 2020.
Jul 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of New York State Teamsters Conference Pension and Retirement Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2020Brief of respondent Metz Culinary Management, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Reply of petitioners The National Retirement Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 11 2020Letter of respondent Metz Culinary Management, Inc.received.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ronald E. Richman
    Counsel of Record
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

Ronald.Richman@srz.com
2127562000
Party name: The National Retirement Fund, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Metz Culinary Management, Inc.
Other
Vincent M. DeBella
    Counsel of Record
Paravati, Karl, Green & DeBella, LLP
520 Seneca Street
Suite 105
Utica, NY 13502

vdebella@pkgdlaw.com
315-735-6481
Party name: New York State Teamsters Conference Pension and Retirement Fund
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sh@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Horizon Actuarial Services, LLC