No. 19-1334
Title:Signode Industrial Group LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Harold Stone, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1601)
   Decision Date:November 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2020 to July 31, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 31, 2020.
Jul 31 2020Brief of respondents Harold Stone, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2020Reply of petitioners Signode Industrial Group LLC and Illinois Tool Works, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joseph James Torres
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

JTorres@jenner.com
312-840-8685
Party name: Signode Industrial Group LLC and Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Leon Dayan
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 Fifteenth St. NW
Ste. 1000
Washington, DC 20005

ldayan@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: Harold Stone, et al.