No. 19-1328
Title:Department of Justice, Petitioner
v.
House Committee on the Judiciary
Docketed:June 1, 2020
Linked with 19A1035
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5288)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 07 2020Application (19A1035) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 08 2020UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5288, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Monday, May 18, 2020, by 3 p.m. ET, and further order of The Chief Justice or of the Court.
May 18 2020Response to application from respondent House Committee on the Judiciary filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 19 2020Reply of applicant Department of Justice filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
May 20 2020Application (19A1035) granted. The application for stay of the mandate presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted. The issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5288, is stayed pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, if such petition is filed on or before June 1, 2020, by 5 p.m. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court. If no petition for a writ of certiorari is filed on or before June 1, 2020, by 5 p.m., the stay shall terminate.
Jun 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2020)
Certificate of Word CountPetition
Jun 15 2020Brief of respondent House Committee on the Judiciary in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2020Reply of petitioner Department of Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition GRANTED.
Aug 03 2020Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 10 2020Joint motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 14, 2020.
Aug 31 2020Brief of petitioner Department of Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 2, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Justice
Attorneys for Respondent
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: House Committee on the Judiciary