No. 19-1316 | |
Title: | Gilberto Garcia-Romo, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | May 28, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-3857) |
Decision Date: | October 4, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 22, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 22 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 29, 2020) |
May 22 2020 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Jun 25 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 29, 2020 to July 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Jun 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 29, 2020. |
Jul 29 2020 | Memorandum of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed. |
Aug 19 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Apr 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021. |
May 03 2021 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Niz-Chavez v. Garland, 593 U. S. ___ (2021). |
Jun 04 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jerome Mayer-Cantu Counsel of Record | 4287 Gilbert Street Oakland, CA 94611 | 415-530-6444 |
Party name: Gilberto Garcia-Romo | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |