No. 19-1315
Title:Nevada, et al., Petitioners
v.
Donald Walden, Jr., et al.
Docketed:May 27, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15691)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 26, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 26, 2020 to August 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 25, 2020.
Aug 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 25, 2020 to August 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 26 2020Brief of Donald Walden, Jr., et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (August 27, 2020)
Aug 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is denied. See Rule 30.2
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 16 2020Response Requested. (Due October 16, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Heidi Jill Parry Stern
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nevada Attorney General
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701

hstern@ag.nv.gov
775-684-1100
Party name: Nevada, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua D. Buck
    Counsel of Record
Thierman Buck LLP
7287 Lakeside Drive
Reno, NV 89511

josh@thiermanbuck.com
775-284-1500
Party name: Donald Walden, Jr., et al.