No. 19-131
Title:Duanna Knighton, Petitioner
v.
Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians, et al.
Docketed:July 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15515)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 26, 2019 to October 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 10, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Leslie Deedon
    Counsel of Record
Maire & Deedon
2851 Park Marina Drive, Suite 300
Redding, CA 96001

pdeedon@maire-law.com
(530) 246-6050
Party name: DUANNA KNIGHTON
Attorneys for Respondents
Jack Duran Jr.Duran Law Office
4010 Foothills Blvd, Suite 103, No. 98
Roseville, CA 95747

916-779-3316
Party name: Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians, the Tribal Court and Judge Patricia Lenzi