No. 19-1309
Title:Kari Janae Phipps, Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:May 21, 2020
Linked with 19A991
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(46145)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2020Application (19A991) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 19, 2020 to May 18, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Application (19A991) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 18, 2020.
May 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 22, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent Idaho to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jun 25 2020Response Requested. (Due July 27, 2020)
Jul 23 2020Brief of respondent Idaho in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 12, 2020 to August 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 03 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until August 26, 2020, granted.
Aug 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 26 2020Reply of petitioner Kari Janae Phipps filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
777 6th St. NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Kari Janae Phipps
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth K. Jorgensen
    Counsel of Record
Off of Attny Gen - State of ID
Statehouse Room 210
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

ken.jorgensen@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-2400
Party name: Idaho
Other
Akiva Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

ashapiro@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-3830
Party name: Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers