No. 19-1307 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Edward Thomas, Warden, Petitioner
v.
William Leroy Barnes
Docketed:May 20, 2020
Linked with 19A996
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5)
   Decision Date:September 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2020Application (19A996) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2020 to May 16, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Application (19A996) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 16, 2020.
May 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
Jul 20 2020Brief of respondent William Leroy Barnes in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent William Leroy Barnes.
Main Document
Aug 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Porter Babb
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
114 W. Edenton Street
Raleigh, NC 27601

jbabb@ncdoj.gov
919-716-6575
Party name: Edward Thomas
Attorneys for Respondent
Milton Gordon Widenhouse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Rudolf Widenhouse
Post Office Box 2663
Chapel Hill, NC 27515

mgwidenhouse@rudolfwidenhouse.com
919-967-4900
Party name: William Leroy Barnes