No. 19-1306
Title:United Parcel Service, Inc., Petitioner
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:May 20, 2020
Linked with 19A901
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1993, 17-2107, 17-2111)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 19, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2020Application (19A901) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 18, 2020 to May 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 13 2020Application (19A901) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 17, 2020.
May 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 10 2020Motion of the State of New York to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 11 2020Motion of the City of New York to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020.
Jun 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020, for all respondents.
Jul 09 2020Motion of respondent City of New York to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2020 to August 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 3, 2020, for all respondents.
Aug 03 2020Brief of respondents State of New York et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2020Brief of respondent The City of New York in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2020Reply of petitioner United Parcel Service, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: The City of New York